U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30039-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fast Horse
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 12, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 12, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 06, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 06, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 02, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • July 23, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • July 19, 2019: [Furlough]
  • July 02, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 28, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 28, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • June 28, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • June 28, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • June 28, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 28, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • June 28, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 28, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 21, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2018
  • August 06, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 06, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 06, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 02, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 02, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 12, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • July 12, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • July 11, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 10, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 10, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 10, 2018: [Order]
  • July 10, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 10, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 10, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 10, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 25, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 22, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 22, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 22, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 22, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 22, 2018: [Notice]
  • June 22, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 02, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 02, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 02, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • October 02, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2017
  • September 14, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 14, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 14, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 11, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • August 22, 2017: [Furlough]
  • August 17, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2017
  • July 06, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 06, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 22, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 22, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 22, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 11, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 11, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 27, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 27, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order]
  • March 21, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 21, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 21, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 21, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 21, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 21, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 20, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 20, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 20, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • March 20, 2017: [Request]
  • March 20, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • March 20, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 20, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 17, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 16, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 16, 2017: [Indictment]
  • March 16, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.