U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-10012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Eagle Pipe
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 15, 2022: [Consent]
  • February 15, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 10, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • December 06, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 06, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • November 19, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 14, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 13, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 13, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 13, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 13, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 13, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 13, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 13, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • October 13, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 08, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 05, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2019
  • January 07, 2019: [USCA Opinion]
  • January 07, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
October, 2017
  • October 10, 2017: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • September 22, 2017: [Transcript - Public]
  • September 22, 2017: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • September 20, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • September 19, 2017: [Court Reporter Information]
  • September 19, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • September 19, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • September 12, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 12, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 01, 2017: [Sentencing]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Memorandum Letter]
  • August 29, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 29, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 29, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 23, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 23, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 23, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 16, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 12, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 12, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 16, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 16, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 16, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 11, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 11, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • March 30, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 23, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 23, 2017: [Order]
  • March 22, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 22, 2017: [Request]
  • March 22, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 22, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 22, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 22, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 22, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 22, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 22, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 22, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • March 21, 2017: [Request]
  • March 20, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • March 20, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 16, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 16, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 16, 2017: [Indictment]
  • March 16, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.