U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dog Soldier
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 14, 2018: [Forfeiture]
  • June 14, 2018: [Declaration of Publication]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 21, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 21, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 21, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
  • August 21, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • August 15, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 15, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 15, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 10, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • July 21, 2017: [Forfeiture]
  • July 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 18, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 17, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 06, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 05, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 24, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 22, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 22, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 22, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 02, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Order]
  • April 27, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • April 13, 2017: [Request]
  • April 13, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 12, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 12, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 11, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 10, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 10, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 10, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • April 10, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 10, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 10, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 10, 2017: [Arrest]
  • April 10, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • April 07, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2017
  • March 16, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 16, 2017: [Indictment]
  • March 16, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.