U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Red Bird
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 04, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 04, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 04, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 31, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 11, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 27, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
July, 2019
  • July 01, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 01, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 28, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 28, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • June 28, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • June 28, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • June 28, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 28, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 28, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2017
  • July 17, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 17, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 06, 2017: [Sentencing]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 26, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 26, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 13, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • May 23, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 17, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 14, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 07, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 04, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 04, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 04, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Order]
  • March 23, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • March 22, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • March 21, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 17, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 17, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 17, 2017: [Request]
  • March 16, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 16, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 16, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 16, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 16, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 16, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 16, 2017: [Arrest]
  • March 16, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 16, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 16, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 16, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 16, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • March 16, 2017: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 16, 2017: [Indictment]
  • March 16, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 16, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.