U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Erickson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 01, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
February, 2018
  • February 02, 2018: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • January 29, 2018: [Exhibit List]
December, 2017
  • December 01, 2017: [Judgment of Acquittal]
  • December 01, 2017: [Verdict]
  • December 01, 2017: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • December 01, 2017: [Jury Trial Held (One Day Trial)]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Jury Instructions (Redacted)]
  • November 30, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • November 29, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • November 28, 2017: [Jury List]
  • November 28, 2017: [Voir Dire Began]
  • November 28, 2017: [In Limine]
  • November 27, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • November 27, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • November 24, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • November 22, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • November 22, 2017: [Witness List]
  • November 22, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 22, 2017: [In Limine]
  • November 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • November 21, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 21, 2017: [In Limine]
  • November 21, 2017: [Extend]
  • November 21, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 21, 2017: [Furlough]
  • November 20, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • November 20, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions (Redacted)]
  • November 20, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • November 20, 2017: [Witness List]
  • November 20, 2017: [Notice]
  • November 17, 2017: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • November 17, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 17, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • November 17, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 17, 2017: [In Limine]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • November 15, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • November 15, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • November 15, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 14, 2017: [Jury List]
  • November 14, 2017: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • November 07, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 06, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 13, 2017: [Consent]
  • October 03, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 18, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 07, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2017
  • August 09, 2017: [Sealed Evaluation]
July, 2017
  • July 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 10, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 20, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 20, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 20, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 20, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 19, 2017: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 17, 2017: [Consent]
  • May 10, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2017
  • April 03, 2017: [Order]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 30, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • March 28, 2017: [Request]
  • March 27, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 27, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 24, 2017: [Request]
  • March 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 21, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 21, 2017: [Withdraw Document]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 21, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 21, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 21, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 21, 2017: [Arrest]
  • March 20, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 20, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 20, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • March 20, 2017: [Request]
  • March 17, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 17, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 16, 2017: [Redacted Indictment / Superseding Indictment for Service]
  • March 16, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 16, 2017: [Indictment]
  • March 16, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.