U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Yellow Earring
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 16, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 15, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 08, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 08, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • June 08, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 03, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • May 25, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 25, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 25, 2022: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • May 25, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 25, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2017
  • November 07, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 07, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 06, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • November 06, 2017: [Sentencing]
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 20, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 20, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 20, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 12, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 11, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 15, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 15, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 14, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 11, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 11, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 11, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 08, 2017: [Extend]
July, 2017
  • July 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 29, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • April 28, 2017: [Furlough]
  • April 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 11, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 11, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Order]
  • March 21, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 21, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 20, 2017: [Request]
  • March 20, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 17, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 17, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • March 16, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 16, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 16, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 16, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • March 16, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 16, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 16, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 16, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 16, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 16, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • March 16, 2017: [Request]
  • March 16, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 16, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 16, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 16, 2017: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 16, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 16, 2017: [Add Counts - Indictment]
  • March 16, 2017: [Indictment]
  • March 16, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 16, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.