U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Two Eagle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 05, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 05, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 04, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 01, 2022: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • April 01, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 11, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 10, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 09, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • February 09, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 09, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 09, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 09, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • February 09, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 09, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • February 08, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • August 16, 2018: [Forfeiture]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Declaration of Publication]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 20, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 19, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • September 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 11, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 07, 2017: [Continue]
  • September 06, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • September 05, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 05, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Forfeiture]
  • August 31, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 25, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 11, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 28, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 26, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 24, 2017: [Oral Order]
  • June 23, 2017: [Order]
  • June 23, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 22, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 22, 2017: [Consent]
  • June 21, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 19, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 19, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 19, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 31, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 31, 2017: [Consent]
  • May 31, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Request]
  • April 18, 2017: [Order]
  • April 18, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 13, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 13, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • April 13, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • April 13, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 13, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 13, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 13, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 13, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • April 12, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 12, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • April 12, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 12, 2017: [Request]
  • April 12, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • April 12, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 12, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 10, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 07, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
March, 2017
  • March 16, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 16, 2017: [Indictment]
  • March 16, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.