U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-10031
  • Case Name: Stacy Ann Stickle
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Trustee's Report of Small Dividends/Unclaimed Funds]
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Allowing Administrative Expense (Text Order)]
April, 2018
  • April 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation]
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation]
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Objection to Claim]
  • August 01, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
July, 2017
  • July 14, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 27, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Approving Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • June 26, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Support Document]
  • June 14, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Deadlines]
  • June 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • June 05, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement Re: Undeliverable or Returned Mail]
  • June 05, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 22, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • May 22, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
  • May 16, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • April 03, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 18, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 16, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 16, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • March 16, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 16, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 16, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • March 16, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • March 16, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 16, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 16, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.