U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Taylor
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • January 02, 2019: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 24, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 23, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • October 23, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • October 16, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 16, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 16, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 02, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 04, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 04, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 31, 2017: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 07, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 07, 2017: [Bond Hearing]
  • June 07, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • June 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • June 07, 2017: [Reconsideration]
May, 2017
  • May 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • May 09, 2017: [Discovery]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Response]
  • April 14, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 14, 2017: [Request]
  • April 14, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 12, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 11, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
March, 2017
  • March 17, 2017: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • March 16, 2017: [Remark]
  • March 16, 2017: [Rule 20 - Transfer In]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.