U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50132-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Warrior
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Order re Exhibits]
January, 2019
  • January 09, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • November 15, 2018: [Judgment of Acquittal]
  • November 15, 2018: [Verdict]
  • November 15, 2018: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • November 15, 2018: [Jury Question]
  • November 15, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • November 15, 2018: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • November 15, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • November 14, 2018: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • November 13, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • November 13, 2018: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • November 13, 2018: [Jury List]
  • November 09, 2018: [Order]
  • November 08, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
  • November 06, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 05, 2018: [Order]
  • November 02, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 01, 2018: [Supplement]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Response]
  • October 25, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • October 17, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 20, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Extend]
  • June 27, 2018: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • June 21, 2018: [Extend]
  • June 21, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 21, 2018: [Transcript]
  • June 04, 2018: [Extend]
  • June 01, 2018: [Request]
  • June 01, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 22, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 22, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 16, 2018: [Sealed Evaluation]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Order]
  • March 05, 2018: [Notice]
February, 2018
  • February 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Reply]
  • January 25, 2018: [Psychiatric Exam]
  • January 25, 2018: [Response]
  • January 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 18, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 17, 2018: [Supplement]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 30, 2017: [Extend]
  • November 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 20, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 20, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • November 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 14, 2017: [Brief]
  • November 14, 2017: [Notice]
  • November 14, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • November 13, 2017: [Response]
  • November 08, 2017: [In Limine]
  • November 08, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 07, 2017: [Brief]
  • November 07, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • November 07, 2017: [Notice]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Order]
  • October 31, 2017: [In Limine]
  • October 30, 2017: [Request]
  • October 30, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 26, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 26, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 26, 2017: [Notice]
  • October 25, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 14, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 23, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 17, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 17, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • March 20, 2017: [Request]
  • March 17, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 17, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 17, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 17, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 17, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 17, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 17, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 17, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 17, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • March 16, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 16, 2017: [Arrest]
  • March 16, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.