U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-05003
  • Case Name: Allred v. Jordan
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 16, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Receipt of Filing Fee]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • November 01, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Approve Agreement/Stipulation]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • September 20, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Approve Agreement (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation)]
  • September 20, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Stipulation]
May, 2017
  • May 19, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • May 18, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Request for Production of Documents]
  • May 18, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Interrogatories]
  • May 05, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Scheduling Order (pre-trial/trial)]
  • May 05, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 05, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2017
  • April 05, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
  • April 05, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Additional Summons Issued]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
  • March 20, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • March 20, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Statement of Fees - Deferred]
  • March 20, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.