U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-50043
  • Case Name: John Edward Crisafulli
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
  • July 03, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 03, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request for Certified Copy]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • April 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • April 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • March 23, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • March 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • March 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • March 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • March 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
  • March 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • March 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.