U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50052-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mousseaux
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 04, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
  • January 17, 2020: [Order on Petition to Revoke]
  • January 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • January 15, 2020: [Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • January 03, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 02, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • January 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • December 30, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • December 19, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 18, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 18, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 18, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 18, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 18, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 18, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 18, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 18, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 17, 2017: [Sentencing]
September, 2017
  • September 15, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 15, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 15, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • August 24, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 24, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 11, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 09, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 08, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • August 08, 2017: [Transcript - Public]
  • August 08, 2017: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • August 02, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 16, 2017: [Order]
  • June 16, 2017: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • June 16, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • June 16, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 16, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 16, 2017: [Amended Plea Agreement]
  • June 14, 2017: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 16, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 12, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 12, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 12, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 11, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2017
  • April 10, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 27, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 27, 2017: [Request]
  • March 27, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 24, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 24, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 24, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 24, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 24, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 24, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 24, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 24, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • March 23, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 23, 2017: [Arrest]
  • March 22, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 22, 2017: [Indictment]
  • March 22, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.