U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50039-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Leading Cloud
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 02, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 02, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 25, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 16, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 21, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 21, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 21, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 21, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 21, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 21, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 21, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 20, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 31, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 31, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 31, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • January 24, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 24, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 24, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 24, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 24, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 18, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
December, 2017
  • December 12, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 04, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 13, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 13, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 13, 2017: [Consent]
  • October 03, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 02, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 02, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 02, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2017
  • August 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 07, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 16, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 14, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • May 09, 2017: [Request]
  • May 09, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 05, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 05, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 05, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 05, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 05, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 05, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • May 05, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 04, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • May 03, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • April 14, 2017: [Arrest - Other District]
  • April 14, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 22, 2017: [Indictment]
  • March 22, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.