U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Swift Bird
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 07, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2017
  • June 06, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion]
  • June 05, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • June 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • June 01, 2017: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 23, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 16, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 15, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 21, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 21, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 21, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 21, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 21, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 21, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • April 21, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 21, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • April 20, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • April 20, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • April 12, 2017: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • April 12, 2017: [Request]
  • April 12, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 12, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 12, 2017: [Arrest - Other District]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 22, 2017: [Indictment]
  • March 22, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.