U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50051-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Spotted Bear
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Consent]
  • April 28, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 28, 2021: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • April 23, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 29, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 29, 2021: [Consent]
  • March 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 29, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 29, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Consent]
  • December 11, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 11, 2020: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • December 04, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • November 09, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • November 06, 2020: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • November 06, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
April, 2020
  • April 10, 2020: [Status Conference]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 20, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 16, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 13, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • March 13, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 13, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 13, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 13, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
December, 2019
  • December 03, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 03, 2019: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 12, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
September, 2019
  • September 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 16, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 16, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 16, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 16, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 13, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 13, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 13, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 18, 2019: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • April 02, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 12, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 08, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 05, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 05, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 05, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 05, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 04, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
September, 2017
  • September 11, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 11, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 06, 2017: [Sentencing]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 30, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 30, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 23, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
July, 2017
  • July 14, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 13, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 08, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 26, 2017: [Consent]
  • May 26, 2017: [Amended Plea Agreement]
  • May 26, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 24, 2017: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • May 17, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 17, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 17, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 17, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2017
  • April 10, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Request]
  • March 30, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 29, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • March 29, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 29, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 29, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 29, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 29, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 29, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 29, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 29, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 29, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • March 29, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • March 28, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 27, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 24, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 22, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 22, 2017: [Indictment]
  • March 22, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.