U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Edwards
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 28, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 24, 2025: [Furlough]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 10, 2025: [Furlough]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 07, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • November 02, 2022: [Furlough]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 25, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 14, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 22, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
  • September 22, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • September 20, 2022: [Text Order]
  • September 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 19, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 31, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 31, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 30, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 30, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 24, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 24, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 17, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 09, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 30, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 30, 2020: [Text Order of Detention]
  • October 30, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 30, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 16, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 15, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 14, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • October 14, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 14, 2020: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 14, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 14, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 13, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • May 04, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 04, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 03, 2018: [Sentencing]
April, 2018
  • April 09, 2018: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • April 04, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 04, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 04, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 07, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 16, 2018: [Consent]
  • January 16, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 16, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 14, 2018: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 14, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 14, 2018: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 14, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 12, 2018: [Notice]
  • January 12, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 12, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 09, 2018: [Sealed Order]
  • January 05, 2018: [Notice]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Sealed Order]
  • December 22, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 14, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • December 14, 2017: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 12, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 07, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 07, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Order]
  • September 26, 2017: [Redacted Document]
  • September 20, 2017: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
August, 2017
  • August 07, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2017
  • July 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 11, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 11, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2017
  • June 19, 2017: [Order]
  • June 15, 2017: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • June 14, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
May, 2017
  • May 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 01, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 01, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Order]
  • April 18, 2017: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • April 17, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 17, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • April 03, 2017: [Order]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 30, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • March 29, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 29, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 29, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 29, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 29, 2017: [Request]
  • March 29, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 29, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • March 27, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 27, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 27, 2017: [Request]
  • March 24, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 24, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 24, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 24, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 24, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 24, 2017: [Arrest]
  • March 24, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 24, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • March 24, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 24, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 22, 2017: [Redacted Indictment / Superseding Indictment for Service]
  • March 22, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 22, 2017: [Indictment]
  • March 22, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.