U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Geiger
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Transcript]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Transcript]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
March, 2018
  • March 09, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 08, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 08, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • March 08, 2018: [Exhibit List]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 23, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 23, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 13, 2018: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • February 13, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 22, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 11, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 10, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 05, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 29, 2017: [Consent]
  • September 29, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 13, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 13, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 13, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 11, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 08, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 27, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2017
  • June 13, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 09, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 11, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2017
  • April 10, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • March 29, 2017: [Request]
  • March 29, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 27, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 27, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 27, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 27, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 27, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 27, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 27, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 27, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 27, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • March 27, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 27, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 23, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 22, 2017: [Indictment]
  • March 22, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 22, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.