U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hawk Wing
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Order]
  • February 18, 2020: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 06, 2020: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2018
  • March 08, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 07, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 07, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • March 07, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 01, 2018: [Sealed Evaluation]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 28, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 28, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 27, 2018: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
  • February 27, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • February 13, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 13, 2018: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
January, 2018
  • January 18, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 10, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 25, 2017: [Consent]
  • October 25, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 25, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 24, 2017: [Allocution Statement]
  • October 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • October 24, 2017: [Withdraw Document]
  • October 23, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • October 23, 2017: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 29, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 29, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 29, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 29, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 04, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 19, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 23, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 12, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2017
  • April 10, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Redacted Document]
  • March 30, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 30, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 30, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • March 29, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 29, 2017: [Request]
  • March 29, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • March 29, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 29, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 29, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 29, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 29, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 29, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 29, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 29, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 29, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 29, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • March 29, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 28, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 27, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 22, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 22, 2017: [Redacted Indictment / Superseding Indictment for Service]
  • March 22, 2017: [Indictment]
  • March 22, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.