U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fogg
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 21, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 21, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 20, 2022: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 19, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 16, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 16, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 16, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 16, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 16, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 16, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 22, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order on Exhibits]
May, 2019
  • May 02, 2019: [Appeal Record Returned]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
  • March 21, 2019: [USCA Opinion]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • April 19, 2018: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • April 19, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • April 19, 2018: [Transcript]
  • April 17, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • April 17, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • April 16, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • April 15, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • April 15, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • April 15, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • April 05, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • March 30, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • March 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 28, 2018: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • March 27, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • March 27, 2018: [Court Reporter Information]
  • March 26, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 26, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 22, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 22, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 21, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • March 14, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 14, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 14, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
January, 2018
  • January 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 08, 2018: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 05, 2018: [Continue]
  • January 05, 2018: [Transcript]
  • January 04, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • January 04, 2018: [Transcript of Voir Dire]
  • January 04, 2018: [Transcript]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 24, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 04, 2017: [Continue]
  • October 02, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 29, 2017: [Extend]
  • September 15, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Executed]
  • July 28, 2017: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • July 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 26, 2017: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • July 26, 2017: [Verdict]
  • July 26, 2017: [Jury Question]
  • July 26, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • July 26, 2017: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • July 26, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • July 25, 2017: [Jury List]
  • July 25, 2017: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • July 24, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • July 24, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • July 22, 2017: [Supplement]
  • July 12, 2017: [Response]
  • July 11, 2017: [Supplement]
  • July 07, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • July 07, 2017: [Notice]
  • July 06, 2017: [Extend]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [In Limine]
  • June 30, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • June 28, 2017: [Response]
  • June 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 26, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • June 26, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 26, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • June 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 23, 2017: [Notice]
  • June 23, 2017: [Extend]
  • June 23, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 23, 2017: [In Limine]
  • June 23, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • June 22, 2017: [Supplement]
  • June 20, 2017: [Text Order]
  • June 20, 2017: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • June 20, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • June 16, 2017: [Notice]
  • June 13, 2017: [Notice]
  • June 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • June 01, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • June 01, 2017: [Letter]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 22, 2017: [Withdraw Document]
  • May 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 09, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2017
  • April 10, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • March 28, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 28, 2017: [Request]
  • March 27, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 27, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 27, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 27, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 27, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 27, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 27, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 27, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 27, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • March 27, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 27, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 27, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 27, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 23, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 22, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 22, 2017: [Indictment]
  • March 22, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.