U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 05, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 26, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 19, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 19, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 13, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 23, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • December 23, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 23, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 22, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 22, 2020: [Consent]
  • December 22, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 16, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 13, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 10, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 08, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 07, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 07, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 07, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 07, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 07, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 07, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 07, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 26, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 12, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • February 05, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 05, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 05, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
January, 2018
  • January 05, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 21, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 05, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 01, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 01, 2017: [Consent]
  • September 01, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 25, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 25, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 25, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 31, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 28, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 26, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 23, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 26, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 25, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 10, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Request]
  • March 30, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 30, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 30, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 30, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • March 29, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 29, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 29, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 29, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 29, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 29, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 29, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 29, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • March 29, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 28, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 27, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 22, 2017: [Redacted Indictment / Superseding Indictment for Service]
  • March 22, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 22, 2017: [Indictment]
  • March 22, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.