U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50047-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gay
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 15, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 14, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 14, 2018: [Certificate]
  • August 14, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • August 03, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 03, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 03, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 14, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • June 12, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
May, 2018
  • May 01, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 20, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 20, 2018: [Consent]
  • April 20, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 12, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 21, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 21, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 21, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 19, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 15, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 13, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 08, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 15, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 09, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 02, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 03, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 12, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2017
  • May 09, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 02, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 01, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 11, 2017: [Request]
  • April 11, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 07, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 07, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 07, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 07, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 07, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 07, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 07, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • April 07, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 07, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • April 06, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 06, 2017: [Arrest]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Redacted Indictment / Superseding Indictment for Service]
  • March 22, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 22, 2017: [Indictment]
  • March 22, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.