U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 24, 2020: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 25, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 24, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • October 24, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • October 17, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 17, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • September 15, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 15, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 15, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 11, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 01, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 23, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 23, 2017: [Consent]
  • June 23, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 23, 2017: [Amended Plea Agreement]
  • June 23, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 23, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • June 02, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 01, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 01, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 01, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 16, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 27, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 27, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 27, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 27, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 27, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 27, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 27, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 27, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • March 23, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 22, 2017: [Arrest]
  • March 22, 2017: [Indictment]
  • March 22, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 22, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.