U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-10017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Flute
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
June, 2020
  • June 10, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 08, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • March 26, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • March 26, 2020: [Release from Custody]
  • March 26, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • March 26, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • March 18, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 18, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 18, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 13, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 12, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 12, 2020: [Consent]
  • March 12, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 12, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 12, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 11, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 11, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 09, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • March 03, 2020: [USCA Order]
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • January 02, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • December 27, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 20, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 20, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 20, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 13, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 11, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • December 06, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 05, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 05, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 23, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • October 01, 2019: [Information - Felony]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • September 13, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 13, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 13, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 09, 2019: [USCA Order]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Letter]
  • July 12, 2019: [Letter]
  • July 08, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
  • July 08, 2019: [USCA Opinion]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • December 19, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • December 13, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • December 12, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • November 13, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 13, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 08, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 08, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 08, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 27, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 27, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 16, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • June 12, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • June 02, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 02, 2017: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 20, 2017: [Order]
  • April 20, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • April 17, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 17, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 13, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 24, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 24, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • March 23, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 22, 2017: [Request]
  • March 22, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 22, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 22, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 22, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 22, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 22, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 22, 2017: [Court Reporter Information]
  • March 22, 2017: [Arrest]
  • March 22, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 21, 2017: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.