U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-40084
  • Case Name: Diane Sue Myers
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Closing Case]
December, 2017
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
September, 2017
  • September 09, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Nonstandard Motion]
  • July 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 20, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • July 20, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • July 19, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Nonstandard Motion (PRIOR COURT APPROVAL REQUIRED)]
  • July 18, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • July 18, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 18, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Trustee's Report of Small Dividends/Unclaimed Funds]
  • July 14, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 12, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Late Notice]
  • July 12, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 12, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Amendment to Schedules or Statements with Notice]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 29, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 28, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • June 27, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Set Hearing]
  • June 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Response]
  • June 14, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • June 09, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Turnover of Property from Debtor]
  • June 09, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Objection to Debtor(s) Claim of Exemptions]
  • June 06, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney]
May, 2017
  • May 15, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • May 01, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Add Trustee]
  • March 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employee Income Records]
  • March 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • March 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.