U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Medina
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Order re Exhibits]
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [Judgment - Amended]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 05, 2021: [Supplement]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Reply]
  • April 21, 2021: [Response]
  • April 14, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 21, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 13, 2020: [Extend]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Extend]
  • December 23, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 16, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 13, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 13, 2019: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • September 06, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 06, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 06, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • September 06, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 24, 2019: [Continue]
  • June 20, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 18, 2019: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • June 18, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 18, 2019: [Certificate]
  • June 18, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 18, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 04, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 03, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • June 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 28, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 16, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 13, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 15, 2019: [Consent]
  • March 15, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 19, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 19, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 19, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 04, 2019: [Consent]
  • January 04, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • December 27, 2018: [Response]
October, 2018
  • October 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 01, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 01, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 01, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • September 06, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2018
  • August 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • August 08, 2018: [Release from Custody]
June, 2018
  • June 01, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2018
  • May 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 04, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 03, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 14, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 14, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 03, 2018: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 02, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Extend]
  • December 07, 2017: [Request]
  • December 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 04, 2017: [Continue]
  • December 04, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • December 04, 2017: [Transcript]
  • December 01, 2017: [Brief]
  • December 01, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • December 01, 2017: [Notice]
  • December 01, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Notice]
  • November 16, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 14, 2017: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • November 13, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • November 01, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 01, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • November 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • October 02, 2017: [Extend]
September, 2017
  • September 12, 2017: [Request]
  • September 12, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 08, 2017: [Extend]
  • September 07, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 07, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • August 23, 2017: [Evidentiary Hearing]
July, 2017
  • July 11, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Supplement]
  • June 23, 2017: [Supplement]
  • June 21, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 20, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 13, 2017: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
  • June 13, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 13, 2017: [Suppress]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 11, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 29, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • March 27, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 24, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 24, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 24, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 24, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 24, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 24, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 24, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • March 23, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 23, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 22, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 22, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.