U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bryan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 11, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 08, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 05, 2021: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 02, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 19, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 19, 2021: [Consent]
  • January 19, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 19, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • January 19, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • September 18, 2020: [Forfeiture]
February, 2020
  • February 05, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 23, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 16, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 18, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 18, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 18, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 18, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 18, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 18, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 20, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 19, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 11, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 10, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 06, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • June 06, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 06, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
December, 2018
  • December 04, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 03, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 16, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 14, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • October 29, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 20, 2018: [Continue]
  • October 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 11, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 10, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 10, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 10, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 10, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 10, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 10, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 10, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 09, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Declaration of Publication]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
March, 2018
  • March 09, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • March 08, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 26, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 26, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 15, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • February 08, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 08, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 08, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 07, 2018: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Forfeiture]
  • January 17, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 15, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 20, 2017: [Amended Plea Agreement]
  • October 20, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 20, 2017: [Consent]
  • October 20, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 12, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 12, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 12, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 12, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 05, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 05, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2017
  • May 03, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 18, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 10, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 27, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 27, 2017: [Request]
  • March 27, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 24, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 24, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 24, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 24, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 24, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 24, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 24, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 24, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • March 23, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 23, 2017: [Arrest]
  • March 23, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.