U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Morrison
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 13, 2018: [Forfeiture]
  • June 08, 2018: [Declaration of Publication]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Notice]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 20, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 19, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • September 19, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 14, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 11, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 07, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 07, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 31, 2017: [Forfeiture]
  • August 23, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 08, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 28, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 26, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 23, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 23, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 23, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 15, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • May 30, 2017: [Furlough]
  • May 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 03, 2017: [Consent]
  • May 03, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • April 24, 2017: [Redacted Document]
  • April 24, 2017: [Furlough]
  • April 18, 2017: [Request]
  • April 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • April 03, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • April 03, 2017: [Furlough]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 31, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 30, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 29, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 29, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • March 27, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 27, 2017: [Order]
  • March 27, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 27, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 24, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • March 23, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 23, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 23, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 23, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 23, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 23, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 23, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 23, 2017: [Arrest]
  • March 23, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • March 23, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 23, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.