U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sides
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 19, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • June 04, 2018: [Forfeiture]
  • June 04, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 04, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 04, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • May 11, 2018: [Evaluation]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 17, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 17, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 10, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 10, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 10, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 04, 2018: [Evaluation]
January, 2018
  • January 09, 2018: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • December 01, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 11, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
  • October 09, 2017: [Proposed Order]
  • October 09, 2017: [Transport Defendant]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 11, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 11, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 04, 2017: [Consent]
  • August 04, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 04, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • August 02, 2017: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 20, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 20, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 20, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 20, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 06, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 06, 2017: [Order]
  • July 05, 2017: [Status Conference]
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • June 15, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • June 09, 2017: [Competency Report]
April, 2017
  • April 14, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Competency Evaluation]
  • April 11, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Competency Evaluation]
  • March 27, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • March 24, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • March 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • March 24, 2017: [Withdraw Document]
  • March 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • March 23, 2017: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.