U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-50048
  • Case Name: Shavonne Louise Smith
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 04, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
July, 2017
  • July 05, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 03, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
June, 2017
  • June 18, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 16, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Approving Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • June 15, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • June 12, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • June 12, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
May, 2017
  • May 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 18, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • May 18, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • May 18, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • May 17, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 16, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing]
  • May 15, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing]
  • May 15, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reaffirmation Agreement (pro se)]
  • May 05, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Response]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • April 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Abandonment, Compel and Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • April 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 26, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Limited Filers only)]
  • March 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • March 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • March 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • March 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.