U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-40091
  • Case Name: Midwest Farm, L.L.C.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Final Decree]
  • January 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Statement of No Objection (Text Entry)]
  • January 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Final Decree]
  • January 04, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
  • January 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order Request]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
  • November 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 01, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Post Confirmation Order]
  • November 01, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Confirmation of Plan]
  • November 01, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Plan as Confirmed]
  • November 01, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Confirming Plan]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot Summary]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot]
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • October 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot]
  • October 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Limit Exclusivity Period]
  • October 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot]
  • October 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Limit Exclusivity Period (Ch 11)]
  • September 28, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 27, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • September 27, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot]
  • September 26, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • September 26, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Amendment to Mailing List with Notice - Correcting Address (no fee)]
  • September 13, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Approving Disclosure Statement]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • September 06, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Amendment to Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • September 06, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • September 06, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Set Deadlines]
  • September 06, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
August, 2017
  • August 06, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 04, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • August 04, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Limit Exclusivity Period]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 25, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • July 25, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Re Sample Ballot Form]
  • July 25, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Set Deadlines]
  • July 25, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot Form (Sample)]
  • July 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Plan]
  • July 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Disclosure Statement]
  • July 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • July 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Limit Exclusivity Period (Ch 11)]
  • July 21, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 14, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 27, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Assume Lease or Executory Contract]
  • June 15, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Assume Executory Contract or Lease (Filed by DIP or Trustee)]
  • June 14, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 12, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Obtain Credit]
  • June 01, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Obtain Credit]
  • May 23, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • May 23, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Request for Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 23, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Obtain Credit/Incur Debt]
  • May 23, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • May 19, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 17, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Late Notice]
  • May 17, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Amendment to Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • May 09, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Request to Receive Electronic Notice]
  • May 05, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • May 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Inability to Appoint Creditors' Committee]
  • May 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Conclusion]
  • May 01, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Amendment to Schedules or Statements with Notice]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 27, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 25, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Obtain Credit]
  • April 15, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 13, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 13, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Nonstandard Order]
  • April 12, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • April 12, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Obtain Credit]
  • April 12, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Statement of No Objection (Text Entry)]
  • April 12, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • April 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • April 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Obtain Credit]
  • April 10, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Statement of No Objection (Text Entry)]
  • April 08, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 06, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • April 06, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Professional (Text Order)]
  • April 05, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 05, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 05, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Professional]
  • April 05, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Request for Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 05, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Obtain Credit/Incur Debt]
  • April 04, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • April 04, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • April 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • April 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Obtain Credit]
  • April 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • April 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • April 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Statement of No Objection (Text Entry)]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 30, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 29, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Professional]
  • March 27, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • March 27, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 26, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • March 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [List of Equity Security Holders]
  • March 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • March 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • March 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Attorney]
  • March 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Obtain Credit/Incur Debt]
  • March 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Request for Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • March 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Corporate Ownership]
  • March 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Authority to File - Ch 11]
  • March 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [20 Largest Unsecured Creditors]
  • March 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.