U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-50050
  • Case Name: Heath Duane Olson and Emily Jean Olson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • September 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request for Certified Copy]
August, 2017
  • August 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 04, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
July, 2017
  • July 05, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 03, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
June, 2017
  • June 17, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 15, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Approving Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • June 15, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • June 13, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reschedule Hearing]
May, 2017
  • May 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 18, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Approving Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • May 18, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • May 17, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 15, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing]
  • May 15, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • May 09, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing]
  • May 09, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reaffirmation Agreement (pro se)]
  • May 05, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • April 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • April 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 03, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 29, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Response]
  • March 29, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • March 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Dismiss Case]
  • March 26, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Limited Filers only)]
  • March 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • March 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • March 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • March 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.