U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gregg
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • December 20, 2019: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • December 13, 2019: [In Limine]
  • December 06, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 06, 2019: [Notice]
  • December 05, 2019: [Exclude]
  • December 05, 2019: [Notice]
  • December 04, 2019: [Exclude]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Reply]
  • November 04, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Extend]
  • October 24, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 17, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 20, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 13, 2019: [Notice]
  • September 10, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 09, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • August 12, 2019: [Reply]
  • August 08, 2019: [Leave to]
  • August 02, 2019: [Brief]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Text Order]
  • July 12, 2019: [Transcript]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • June 27, 2019: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • June 13, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • June 13, 2019: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • June 13, 2019: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Subpoena Issued]
  • May 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Subpoena(s)]
  • May 30, 2019: [Subpoena(s)]
April, 2019
  • April 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • April 02, 2019: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • April 01, 2019: [Response to Motion]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: [Unseal Document]
  • March 21, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • March 21, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • March 20, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 20, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • March 20, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 19, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 06, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • February 21, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 20, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • February 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • February 20, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • February 20, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 13, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • February 12, 2019: [Extend]
  • February 12, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 07, 2019: [Extend]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Compel ]
  • January 21, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 14, 2019: [Extend]
  • January 03, 2019: [Extend]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Extend]
  • December 10, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 22, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 17, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 17, 2018: [Sealed Order]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • September 26, 2018: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • September 26, 2018: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • September 18, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • September 18, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • September 14, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 14, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 14, 2018: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 06, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 21, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • May 21, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • May 21, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 21, 2018: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • May 16, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • May 09, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 09, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 09, 2018: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • May 07, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 04, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 17, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 17, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 16, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 18, 2017: [Extend]
  • December 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 07, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2017
  • November 13, 2017: [Extend]
  • November 06, 2017: [Extend]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Extend]
  • October 27, 2017: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • October 13, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 08, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 04, 2017: [Response]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Extend]
  • August 17, 2017: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 15, 2017: [Extend]
  • August 08, 2017: [Brief]
  • August 08, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 07, 2017: [Response]
  • August 01, 2017: [Order Referring Motion]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • July 31, 2017: [Transcript]
  • July 31, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 31, 2017: [Disclosure ]
  • July 05, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • July 05, 2017: [Evidentiary Hearing]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 30, 2017: [Order Referring Motion]
  • June 29, 2017: [Notice]
  • June 29, 2017: [Redacted Document]
  • June 23, 2017: [Extend]
  • June 21, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 21, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 16, 2017: [Release from Custody]
  • June 16, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 16, 2017: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • June 16, 2017: [Extend]
  • June 07, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 06, 2017: [Extend]
  • June 06, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 30, 2017: [Suppress]
  • May 26, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • May 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • May 16, 2017: [Substitute Attorney ]
  • May 16, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 18, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 10, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 28, 2017: [Request]
  • March 28, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 27, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 27, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 27, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 27, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 27, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 27, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 27, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 27, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 27, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • March 27, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 27, 2017: [Arrest]
  • March 27, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.