U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:07-cr-40090-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Wood et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Text Order]
  • February 24, 2021: [Letter]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Order on Amended Petition to Revoke]
  • April 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Amended Petition to Revoke]
  • April 15, 2019: [Dismiss Amended Petition to Revoke]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • April 05, 2019: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • February 08, 2019: [Withdraw Document]
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • December 06, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2017
  • May 09, 2017: [Order on Petition to Revoke]
  • May 08, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • May 08, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 01, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 03, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 29, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 28, 2017: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 27, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 27, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 27, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 27, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 27, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 27, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 27, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.