U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:06-cr-30056-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Menard
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 10, 2019: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • May 10, 2019: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 31, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 27, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2018
  • January 05, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 05, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 05, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 05, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 02, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 28, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 21, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 19, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 14, 2017: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 27, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 27, 2017: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • November 22, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • November 22, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 22, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • November 22, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 22, 2017: [Order]
  • November 22, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 22, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 22, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 22, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • November 22, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • November 22, 2017: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 22, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 22, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 22, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 21, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • November 21, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 21, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.