U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50049-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tuttle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 14, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 14, 2025: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Response]
  • June 02, 2022: [Transcript - Redacted]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • May 12, 2022: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 11, 2022: [Transcript Redaction Request]
  • May 05, 2022: [Supplemental Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • May 04, 2022: [Transcript]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • April 29, 2022: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 22, 2022: [Supplemental Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • April 20, 2022: [Transcript - Public]
  • April 20, 2022: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • April 20, 2022: [Transcript]
  • April 20, 2022: [Supplemental Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • April 20, 2022: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • April 19, 2022: [Transcript of Voir Dire]
  • April 19, 2022: [Transcript]
  • April 07, 2022: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • March 10, 2022: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • March 07, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • March 03, 2022: [Extend]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Extend]
  • February 25, 2022: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • February 24, 2022: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • February 23, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • February 18, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • February 18, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • February 18, 2022: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • January 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 25, 2022: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • December 20, 2021: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • December 20, 2021: [Transcript - Public]
  • December 20, 2021: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • December 16, 2021: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 03, 2021: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
  • December 01, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 29, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • November 24, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • November 24, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 22, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 22, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 22, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 22, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 19, 2021: [Sealed Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Existing Document]
  • November 12, 2021: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • November 10, 2021: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • November 09, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 09, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 05, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • November 05, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Redacted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • October 18, 2021: [Seal Existing Document]
  • October 06, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 05, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 01, 2021: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • September 30, 2021: [Order]
  • September 29, 2021: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order re Exhibits]
  • September 29, 2021: [Verdict]
  • September 29, 2021: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • September 29, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • September 29, 2021: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • September 29, 2021: [Jury Instructions]
  • September 29, 2021: [Response to Jury Question]
  • September 29, 2021: [Jury Question]
  • September 27, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
  • September 26, 2021: [Joinder]
  • September 26, 2021: [Response]
  • September 26, 2021: [Transcript]
  • September 26, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
  • September 26, 2021: [In Limine]
  • September 24, 2021: [Transcript]
  • September 23, 2021: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • September 22, 2021: [Transcript]
  • September 20, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions (Redacted)]
  • September 17, 2021: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • September 17, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • September 17, 2021: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 16, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • September 16, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 16, 2021: [Jury Instructions]
  • September 16, 2021: [Jury List]
  • September 16, 2021: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • September 15, 2021: [Sealed Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • September 15, 2021: [Jury List]
  • September 15, 2021: [Sealed Order]
  • September 14, 2021: [Jury List]
  • September 14, 2021: [Voir Dire Began]
  • September 14, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order]
  • September 13, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • September 13, 2021: [Sealed Order]
  • September 13, 2021: [Joinder]
  • September 13, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 13, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 13, 2021: [Reply]
  • September 11, 2021: [Order]
  • September 11, 2021: [Sealed Order]
  • September 10, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 10, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 09, 2021: [Joinder]
  • September 09, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 09, 2021: [Objection]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 09, 2021: [Sealed Order]
  • September 09, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 08, 2021: [Text Order]
  • September 08, 2021: [In Limine]
  • September 08, 2021: [Sealed Order]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Supplement]
  • August 24, 2021: [Supplement]
  • August 23, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • August 20, 2021: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • August 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 18, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 17, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 16, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 16, 2021: [Sealed Order]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 13, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 13, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 12, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 12, 2021: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 11, 2021: [Objection]
  • August 09, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 06, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 04, 2021: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 04, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 03, 2021: [Pretrial Conference]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 03, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • August 02, 2021: [Supplement]
  • August 02, 2021: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • August 02, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 29, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 28, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 27, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 27, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 27, 2021: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order]
  • July 27, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • July 26, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 26, 2021: [Reply]
  • July 26, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • July 23, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 23, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • July 23, 2021: [Reply]
  • July 22, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 22, 2021: [Response]
  • July 22, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • July 21, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 21, 2021: [Joinder]
  • July 20, 2021: [Reply]
  • July 20, 2021: [Response]
  • July 20, 2021: [In Limine]
  • July 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • July 16, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 16, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 16, 2021: [Consent]
  • July 16, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 16, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 15, 2021: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • July 15, 2021: [Leave to]
  • July 15, 2021: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • July 15, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 15, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order]
  • July 14, 2021: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 13, 2021: [Reply]
  • July 13, 2021: [Joinder]
  • July 13, 2021: [Response]
  • July 12, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 12, 2021: [Supplement]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 12, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • July 12, 2021: [Request]
  • July 12, 2021: [Joinder]
  • July 12, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
  • July 12, 2021: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • July 09, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 09, 2021: [In Limine]
  • July 09, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
  • July 09, 2021: [Joinder]
  • July 08, 2021: [Text Order]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 08, 2021: [Joinder]
  • July 08, 2021: [Extend]
  • July 08, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 08, 2021: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • July 08, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 08, 2021: [In Limine]
  • July 08, 2021: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • July 08, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
  • July 08, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 08, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 08, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 07, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 07, 2021: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • July 07, 2021: [Notice]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 30, 2021: [Notice]
  • June 29, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 28, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 22, 2021: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • June 22, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 17, 2021: [Extend]
  • June 16, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • June 14, 2021: [Sealed Order]
  • June 11, 2021: [In Limine]
  • June 11, 2021: [Sealed Order]
  • June 10, 2021: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • June 04, 2021: [Notice]
  • June 04, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
  • June 03, 2021: [Notice]
  • June 02, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 01, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • May 11, 2021: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • May 11, 2021: [Supplement]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 18, 2021: [Stipulation]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 13, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Extend]
  • December 30, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 30, 2020: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • December 23, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 13, 2020: [Extend]
  • December 11, 2020: [Disclosure ]
  • December 02, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 01, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • December 01, 2020: [Disclosure ]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Extend]
  • November 23, 2020: [Disclosure ]
  • November 18, 2020: [Reply]
  • November 17, 2020: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • November 17, 2020: [Supplement]
  • November 17, 2020: [Notice]
  • November 13, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • November 12, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • November 10, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 10, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 10, 2020: [Supplement]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • October 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 13, 2020: [Extend]
  • October 05, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 02, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • September 28, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 28, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 28, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • September 28, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • September 22, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 22, 2020: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • September 21, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 21, 2020: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • September 18, 2020: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • September 17, 2020: [Notice of Expert Witness]
August, 2020
  • August 06, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 05, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • July 17, 2020: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 17, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 15, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 13, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 07, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 29, 2020: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • June 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 23, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 17, 2020: [Order]
  • June 15, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • June 12, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • June 12, 2020: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 11, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 10, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 10, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 08, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • June 08, 2020: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 05, 2020: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • June 04, 2020: [Notice]
  • June 04, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 03, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 03, 2020: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 02, 2020: [Order]
  • June 02, 2020: [Notice]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 26, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 18, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 15, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 08, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 05, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • May 05, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 05, 2020: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 04, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 30, 2020: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 28, 2020: [Objection]
  • April 27, 2020: [Objection]
  • April 24, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 22, 2020: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 17, 2020: [Extend]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Extend]
  • March 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • February 28, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • February 19, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • February 06, 2020: [Text Order]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 08, 2020: [Reply to Motion Response]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Notice]
  • December 19, 2019: [Notice]
  • December 18, 2019: [Notice]
  • December 17, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • December 12, 2019: [Notice]
  • December 09, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 04, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 04, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 03, 2019: [Notice]
  • December 02, 2019: [Notice]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 27, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 27, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 27, 2019: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • November 27, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 20, 2019: [Continue]
  • November 19, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 19, 2019: [Continue]
  • November 13, 2019: [Supplement]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Extend]
  • October 16, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 16, 2019: [Extend]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • September 26, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • September 24, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 17, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 16, 2019: [Reply]
  • September 05, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 03, 2019: [Letter(s) of Support]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Extend]
  • August 29, 2019: [Response]
  • August 24, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • August 17, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 16, 2019: [Brief]
  • August 16, 2019: [Notice]
  • August 16, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 08, 2019: [Stipulation]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • July 15, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 15, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 15, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 13, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 13, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 12, 2019: [Notice]
  • July 12, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 11, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 11, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 11, 2019: [In Limine]
  • July 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 11, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • July 11, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • July 03, 2019: [Extend]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 27, 2019: [Disclosure ]
  • June 27, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 26, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • June 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • June 18, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 11, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 11, 2019: [Consent]
  • June 11, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 04, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 03, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 03, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 03, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • May 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • May 28, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 13, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 10, 2019: [Notice]
  • May 06, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: [Response]
  • April 05, 2019: [Extend]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: [Extend]
  • March 15, 2019: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • February 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • February 12, 2019: [Extend]
  • February 08, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • January 11, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 02, 2019: [Extend]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 20, 2018: [Extend]
  • December 14, 2018: [Order]
  • December 07, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 07, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 26, 2018: [Extend]
  • November 26, 2018: [Supplement]
  • November 21, 2018: [Extend]
  • November 17, 2018: [Sever Defendant]
  • November 16, 2018: [Supplement]
  • November 16, 2018: [Continue]
  • November 14, 2018: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • November 09, 2018: [Supplement]
  • November 02, 2018: [Extend]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Extend]
  • October 11, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • October 11, 2018: [Transcript]
  • October 03, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • October 03, 2018: [Transcript]
  • October 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 18, 2018: [Extend]
  • September 18, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 17, 2018: [Response]
  • September 12, 2018: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • August 30, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • August 30, 2018: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • August 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 29, 2018: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • August 27, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 20, 2018: [Subpoena Returned Executed (EX PARTE)]
  • August 13, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Subpoena Issued]
  • July 30, 2018: [Order]
  • July 27, 2018: [Subpoena Issued]
  • July 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Subpoena(s)]
  • July 26, 2018: [Subpoena(s)]
  • July 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 25, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • July 23, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 18, 2018: [Response]
  • July 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 16, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 16, 2018: [Continue]
  • July 16, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • July 10, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 22, 2018: [Witness List]
  • June 22, 2018: [Supplement]
  • June 22, 2018: [Response]
  • June 22, 2018: [Continue]
  • June 22, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 22, 2018: [Transcript]
  • June 21, 2018: [Supplement]
  • June 20, 2018: [Extend]
  • June 19, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 19, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 19, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 13, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 12, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 11, 2018: [Notice]
  • June 07, 2018: [Objection]
  • June 05, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 01, 2018: [Subpoena(s)]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Reply]
  • May 29, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 29, 2018: [Extend]
  • May 23, 2018: [Sever Defendant]
  • May 22, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • May 22, 2018: [1 - Ex Parte Document]
  • May 22, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 22, 2018: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • May 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 22, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 18, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 02, 2018: [Extend]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 10, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • April 06, 2018: [Extend]
  • April 05, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 05, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 05, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 03, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 02, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 02, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 02, 2018: [Request]
  • April 02, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 30, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 30, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 30, 2018: [Text Order]
  • March 30, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • March 30, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 30, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 29, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • March 28, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 26, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 26, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • March 22, 2018: [Extend]
  • March 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • March 21, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • March 21, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • March 21, 2018: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • March 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 12, 2018: [Extend]
  • March 12, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 09, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 09, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 08, 2018: [Suppress]
  • March 08, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 07, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 07, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 05, 2018: [Extend]
  • March 01, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 01, 2018: [Response]
  • March 01, 2018: [Extend]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Extend]
  • February 26, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 22, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 22, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 22, 2018: [Suppress]
  • February 21, 2018: [Extend]
  • February 21, 2018: [Notice]
  • February 16, 2018: [Extend]
  • February 12, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 12, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 12, 2018: [Suppress]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 23, 2018: [Request]
  • January 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 18, 2018: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 16, 2018: [Response]
  • January 12, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 12, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 11, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • January 09, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • January 05, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 05, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Request]
  • December 27, 2017: [Request]
  • December 27, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 27, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 27, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • December 27, 2017: [Transcript]
  • December 26, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 26, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 26, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • December 26, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 26, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 26, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 26, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • December 26, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 22, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 21, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 21, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 21, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 21, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 21, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • December 21, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 21, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • December 21, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 11, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 07, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 06, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 06, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 06, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 06, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 06, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • December 04, 2017: [Sealed Order]
  • December 01, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • December 01, 2017: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 30, 2017: [Arrest - Other District]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • October 23, 2017: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • October 19, 2017: [Response]
July, 2017
  • July 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 30, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 26, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 19, 2017: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • June 16, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 12, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 09, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 02, 2017: [Extend]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • May 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • May 23, 2017: [Redacted Document]
  • May 23, 2017: [Vacate (Not 28:2255)]
  • May 19, 2017: [Release from Custody]
  • May 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 18, 2017: [Notice]
  • May 09, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 05, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Notice]
  • April 18, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • April 10, 2017: [Response]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Request]
  • March 29, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 29, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 29, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 29, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 29, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 29, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 29, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 29, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 29, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • March 28, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 28, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 28, 2017: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.