U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Backward
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 10, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 09, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 03, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 16, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 16, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 16, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 14, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
October, 2017
  • October 03, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 03, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • September 21, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 21, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 21, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 19, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2017
  • August 14, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 09, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 22, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • June 20, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 09, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 09, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 09, 2017: [Waiver]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 18, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 18, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 18, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 18, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 18, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
April, 2017
  • April 04, 2017: [Request]
  • April 04, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 03, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 30, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 30, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 30, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 30, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 30, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 30, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 30, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 30, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 30, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • March 30, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 30, 2017: [Arrest]
  • March 30, 2017: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 29, 2017: [For Order]
  • March 29, 2017: [Information - Felony]
  • March 29, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.