U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-04044
  • Case Name: Wilson v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [Judgment]
  • July 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • July 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • July 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 19, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • July 19, 2018: [Order on Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • July 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Disqualify]
  • July 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2018
  • March 07, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • February 05, 2018: [Letter Sent]
  • February 05, 2018: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
January, 2018
  • January 02, 2018: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • January 02, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Response]
  • December 26, 2017: [Letter Received]
  • December 26, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • December 26, 2017: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • December 06, 2017: [Order to Show Cause]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • November 24, 2017: [Exclude]
  • November 21, 2017: [Letter Received]
  • November 15, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
  • November 09, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 09, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • November 03, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 03, 2017: [Response to Motion]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 25, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 16, 2017: [Disqualify]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 25, 2017: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 25, 2017: [Response to Motion to Vacate (28:2255)]
  • August 21, 2017: [Letter Received]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
  • July 10, 2017: [Objection]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Certificate]
  • June 29, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • June 19, 2017: [Letter Received]
  • June 15, 2017: [Letter Received]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • May 25, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
  • May 22, 2017: [Certificate]
  • May 19, 2017: [Notice]
  • May 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • May 10, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 10, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
  • May 10, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 10, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • May 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 08, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 08, 2017: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • May 08, 2017: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (28:2255) (COURT USE ONLY)]
April, 2017
  • April 10, 2017: [Letter Received]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • March 31, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 31, 2017: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (28:2255) (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.