U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fischer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 04, 2019: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • March 04, 2019: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
October, 2018
  • October 10, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 06, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
  • December 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • December 04, 2017: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
  • November 29, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 27, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 27, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 27, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 27, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • November 27, 2017: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • November 21, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 16, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 16, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 16, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 14, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 13, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 09, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 02, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 01, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • November 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
October, 2017
  • October 03, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Amended]
  • October 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 28, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 26, 2017: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • September 26, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • September 26, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 25, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 25, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 25, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 22, 2017: [Extend]
  • September 19, 2017: [Extend]
  • September 18, 2017: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • September 08, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 06, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • September 06, 2017: [Transcript]
  • September 01, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • September 01, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
August, 2017
  • August 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 14, 2017: [Response]
  • July 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 12, 2017: [Extend]
  • July 07, 2017: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • July 06, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 06, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 05, 2017: [Suppress]
  • July 05, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 25, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 25, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 04, 2017: [Order]
  • April 04, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 04, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 04, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • April 03, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 31, 2017: [Request]
  • March 31, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 31, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • March 31, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 31, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • March 31, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 31, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 31, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 31, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 31, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 31, 2017: [Arrest]
  • March 31, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 30, 2017: [Request]
  • March 30, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 30, 2017: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.