U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-40109
  • Case Name: Selmar Arthur Waller
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
January, 2018
  • January 04, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • January 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Allowing Administrative Expense (Text Order)]
December, 2017
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 05, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation]
  • December 05, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation]
November, 2017
  • November 19, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 21, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Objection to Claim]
  • September 05, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • September 04, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request for Certified Copy]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 25, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
June, 2017
  • June 19, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • June 16, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 14, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
  • June 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • May 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
April, 2017
  • April 06, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
  • April 05, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 05, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • March 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • March 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.