U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-03002
  • Case Name: Jones v. AAA Collections et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 06, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • June 06, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Returned Mail]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Returned Mail]
  • May 21, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 19, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
  • May 11, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 06, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 06, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Nonstandard Application (PRIOR COURT APPROVAL REQUIRED)]
  • May 04, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • May 04, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Clerk's Entry of Default]
April, 2017
  • April 05, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
  • April 04, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
  • April 03, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • April 03, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.