U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-40113
  • Case Name: Donald Victor Szymik and Maureen Kay Szymik
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 20, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Closing Case]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
March, 2021
  • March 06, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Allowing Administrative Expense (text order)]
February, 2021
  • February 21, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 19, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Confirm Termination or Absence of Stay]
  • February 18, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Order Request]
  • February 07, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation]
  • February 04, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Confirm Termination or Absence of Stay]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Report of Sale (Text Entry)]
  • March 08, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 06, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Sell Property]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
  • February 26, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Reduced Notice]
  • February 26, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • February 26, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Sell Property]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 09, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • October 08, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • October 07, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Vacate Order]
  • October 01, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Professional]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Response]
  • September 23, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • September 20, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service]
  • September 20, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Vacate Order (No Notice Required)]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement re: Death/Incompetency of Debtor]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Request to Receive Electronic Notice]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Amend Order]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Amend Order (No Notice Required)]
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Approve Compromise under Rule 9019]
  • March 03, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Relief from Automatic Stay]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Response]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Approve Agreement under Rule 9019 (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation)]
  • February 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
  • February 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service]
  • February 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • February 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
January, 2019
  • January 13, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Sell Property]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Sell Property]
  • December 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Relief from Automatic Stay]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Hearing Minutes (New)]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • November 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Response]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2018
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Exhibits Destroyed]
  • July 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Application 1,000 or Less (Without Notice)]
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Compensation 1,000 or Less (Without Notice)]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • June 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
  • June 10, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Relief from Automatic Stay]
  • May 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Trustee's Motion to Reschedule Hearing]
  • May 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • May 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Response]
  • May 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Clerk's Certificate of Service (Text Entry)]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Trustee's Motion to Reschedule Hearing]
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Set Hearing]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Response]
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Set Hearing]
  • April 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
  • April 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Response]
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Turnover of Property from Debtor]
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Compensation]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • March 24, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Professional (Text Order)]
  • March 21, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • March 21, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Relief from Automatic Stay]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Set Hearing]
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Response]
  • March 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Objection to Debtor(s) Claim of Exemptions]
  • March 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Professional]
  • March 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • March 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney]
  • March 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Late Notice]
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Compensation]
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
  • January 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • January 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Intention]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Court's Exhibit and Witness List]
  • December 17, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 15, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service]
  • December 15, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • December 15, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • December 15, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Convert Case to 7]
  • December 15, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit and/or Witness List]
  • December 05, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit and/or Witness List]
  • December 01, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit and/or Witness List]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • November 15, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 14, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Set Deadlines]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Re Sample Ballot Form]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot Form (Sample)]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Disclosure Statement]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Plan]
  • November 05, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Reschedule Hearing]
  • November 02, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • November 02, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Reschedule Hearing]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Returned Mail]
  • October 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • October 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Debtor Report of Sale (Ch 11, 12 or 13)]
  • October 23, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • October 21, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Sell Property]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • October 18, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • October 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • October 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Reduced Notice]
  • October 10, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • October 10, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • October 10, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Sell Property]
  • October 08, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 06, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing]
  • October 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Response]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Request for Production of Documents]
  • September 18, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • September 18, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • September 09, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 08, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Set Evidentiary Hearing]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing]
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • August 09, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Limit Exclusivity Period]
  • August 01, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • August 01, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Convert Case to 7 (Filed by UST or Trustee Only)]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • July 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 20, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • July 20, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • July 12, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • July 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 09, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 08, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • July 06, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing]
  • July 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • July 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Response]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
  • June 26, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • June 26, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
  • June 20, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Withdrawal of Claim (Text Entry)]
  • June 16, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • June 16, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • June 16, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 15, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • May 15, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Late Notice]
  • May 12, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • May 12, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Amendment to Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • May 10, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Request to Receive Electronic Notice]
  • May 04, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Inability to Appoint Creditors' Committee]
  • May 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Conclusion]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 25, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • April 25, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • April 25, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 17, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Attorney]
  • April 17, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 17, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Employee Income Records]
  • April 17, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Income - Ch 11 - Form 22B]
  • April 17, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 17, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules]
  • April 17, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Schedules A-J]
  • April 13, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 10, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Limited Filers only)]
  • April 06, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 05, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 04, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Late Notice]
  • April 04, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Amendment to Mailing List with Notice - Correcting Address (no fee)]
  • April 04, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • April 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [20 Largest Unsecured Creditors]
  • April 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.