U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30006
  • Case Name: Milton J. Jeffries
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • April 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • April 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • April 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Late Notice]
  • April 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amendment to Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • April 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amendment to Petition with Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.