U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Alvarez-Valenzuela
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 31, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • May 31, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 30, 2017: [Consent]
  • May 30, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 23, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 23, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 10, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 02, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 02, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 02, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 27, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • April 10, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 10, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • April 04, 2017: [Oral Order]
  • April 04, 2017: [Indictment]
  • April 04, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.