U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30047-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thompson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Transcript]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Transcript]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 31, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 30, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • October 30, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • October 23, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • October 23, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 23, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 23, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 19, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 12, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 03, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 03, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 03, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 02, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 15, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 14, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 07, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 03, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 03, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 03, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2017
  • July 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 29, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 05, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 02, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Extend]
  • May 26, 2017: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Search/Seizure/Tracking Device Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 07, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • April 07, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 07, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 07, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 07, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • April 07, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 06, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • April 05, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 05, 2017: [Search & Seizure Warrant Issued]
  • April 05, 2017: [Application for Search/Seizure/Tracking Device Warrant]
  • April 04, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • April 04, 2017: [Indictment]
  • April 04, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 04, 2017: [Order]
  • April 04, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.