U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-50057
  • Case Name: Casey Lee Bertolotto
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
August, 2017
  • August 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 04, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
July, 2017
  • July 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Approving Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • July 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
June, 2017
  • June 18, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 16, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing]
  • June 15, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Support Document]
  • June 09, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 08, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • June 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • June 04, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 02, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Deadlines]
  • June 02, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • May 26, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
April, 2017
  • April 08, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (deactivated)]
  • April 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • April 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • April 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.