U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-30002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Good Face
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • October 20, 2020: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 27, 2020: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2018
  • December 14, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 13, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 13, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 11, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 13, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 13, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 26, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 26, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 26, 2018: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 26, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 24, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 24, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 24, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 24, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 24, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 24, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • October 23, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 23, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 23, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 23, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • October 22, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 16, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2017
  • June 02, 2017: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
  • April 07, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 06, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.