U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-10039
  • Case Name: Jesse Paul Skarnagel and Michelle Lin Skarnagel
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • October 18, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Nonstandard Motion]
  • October 18, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 17, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Nonstandard Motion (PRIOR COURT APPROVAL REQUIRED)]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Fee Due (Create Outstanding Fee)]
  • August 24, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amendment to Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • August 24, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amendment to Petition with Notice]
  • August 19, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 17, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • August 17, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • August 01, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • July 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay]
  • July 06, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 06, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
  • June 15, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • June 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • June 08, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 05, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • May 23, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • May 04, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Intention]
  • May 04, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • May 04, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules]
  • May 04, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedules A-J]
  • May 03, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 01, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 01, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • May 01, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Hearing (For Confirmations, Obj to Claims and Withdraw as Atty (LBR 2091-1(b)) ONLY)]
  • May 01, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • May 01, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • April 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (Text Order)]
  • April 18, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 17, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
  • April 10, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 08, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 06, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amendment to Petition with Notice]
  • April 06, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 05, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.