U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30007
  • Case Name: Wanda Lee Amundson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request for Certified Copy]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • May 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
April, 2017
  • April 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • April 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (deactivated)]
  • April 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • April 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • April 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.