U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-50060
  • Case Name: Holly Christine Cotner and John Everett Cotner
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 08, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • May 26, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • May 09, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • May 01, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • April 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • April 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • April 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • April 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Intention]
  • April 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Schedules A-J]
  • April 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 13, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 09, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • April 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.